Sunday, February 3, 2008

Vedic Maths Shortcut - Multiplication by 12

Here's have a look at how the 12’s shortcut work?

Let’s take a look.
12 X 7

the first thing is to always multiply the 1 of the twelve by the number we are multiplying
by, in this case 7. So 1 X 7 = 7.

Multiply this 7 by 10 giving 70. (Why? We are working with BASES here. Bases are the
fundamentals to easy calculations for all multiplication tables.

Now multiply the 7 by the 2 of twelve giving 14. Add this to 70 giving 84.

Therefore 7 X 12 = 84

Let’s try another:

17 X 12

Remember, multiply the 17 by the 1 in 12 and multiply by 10

(Just add a zero to the end):

1 X 17 = 17, multiplied by 10 giving 170.

Multiply 17 by 2 giving 34.

Add 34 to 170 giving 204.

So 17 X 12 = 204

lets go one more

24 X 12

Multiply 24 X 1 = 24. Multiply by 10 giving 240.

Multiply 24 by 2 = 48. Add to 240 giving us 288

24 X 12 = 288 (Seems Simple, Isnt ?? They are !!)

5 comments:

Charlie~Thotti said...

what a lol.. anyone who falls for this ought to be declared the Weakest in Maths! ha!

P.S said...

Well said Abi. I assume half of the people are in transition from weak to strong.So bear with their weakness..!

augursmiles said...

The technique looks simple, yet have never known it. Thanks for sharing such info.

Anonymous said...

There is no necessity to multiply the 1 of twelve to the number .

This is merely a method known as chunking . whereby
12 = (10 + 2) so

12*7 = (10*7) + (2*7)

you can use the same method to calculate all numbers that are near 10

For example

667*9 = ??

9 = (10 -1)

so

667*9 =(667*10)-(667*1)
= 6670-667
= 6003

67*9 = ??
= 670-67
= 603

rk said...

Hi.. Thanks for this informative article. I really liked it. I also came across this similar site with nice articles and videos on vedic prinicples - http://www.vichaar.tv